Financial history THE AIR CHARITIES TRUST

Charity number: 286915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £42.84k £35.97k £35.32k £35.21k £36.32k
Total expenditure £48.15k £37.15k £33.20k £36.21k £37.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A