THE HEALTH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 286967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Health Foundation is an independent charity committed to bringing about better health and health care for people in the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Austria
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PPP HEALTHCARE MEDICAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
  • PPP MEDICAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
  • THE PPP FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR HUGH TAYLOR KCB Chair 13 April 2017
CICELY SAUNDERS INTERNATIONAL
Rachel Wintour Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
James Roland Sinker Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
Paul John Najsarek Trustee 01 March 2023
Waythrough
Received: On time
THE RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
Ravi Gurumurthy Trustee 12 March 2021
None on record
Professor Dawn Edge Trustee 12 March 2021
None on record
Katherine Blacklock Trustee 12 March 2021
None on record
David Smart Trustee 16 May 2019
BEAT (FORMERLY EATING DISORDERS ASSOCIATION)
Received: On time
Dr Ruth Hussey Trustee 09 February 2018
THE READER ORGANISATION
Received: On time
Eric Gregory Trustee 13 April 2017
PENTON RECREATIONAL CENTRE
Received: 11 days late
Loraine Hawkins Trustee 13 April 2017
None on record
Professor Rosalind Louise Smyth CBE Trustee 04 April 2016
MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LISTER INSTITUTE OF PREVENTIVE MEDICINE
Received: On time
ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.11m £16.38m £17.06m £18.17m £18.56m
Total expenditure £48.83m £57.41m £53.37m £80.41m £62.72m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £173.49k
Income from government grants £1.06m £769.00k £1.14m £1.25m £1.26m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.23m £938.00k £1.42m £1.77m £2.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.88m £15.44m £15.64m £16.40m £16.54m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £37.38m £42.76m £40.33m £66.01m £47.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.45m £14.65m £13.04m £14.40m £14.91m
Expenditure - Governance £43.00k £118.00k £109.00k £119.00k £421.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £16.37m £20.17m £16.60m £37.00m £16.85m
Expenditure - Investment management £11.45m £14.65m £13.04m £14.40m £14.91m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £9.35m £8.30m £7.31m £5.04m £3.85k
Long-term investments £1.08bn £1.12bn £1.23bn £1.18bn £1.20m
Other assets £4.95m £8.22m £7.16m £7.19m £8.90k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 -£570.00k -£546.00k -£464.00k -£438
Total liabilities £36.52m £34.21m £25.30m £41.30m £34.24k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Health Foundation
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
LONDON
EC4Y 8AP
Phone:
02072578000