Trustees URBANWISE.LONDON LIMITED

Charity number: 288102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mike Lachowicz Chair 09 October 2017
None on record
Sarah Katie Jacks Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Mahbuba Khan Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Jordana Smith Trustee 21 October 2020
KICK LONDON
Received: On time
Chloe Kenny Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record
Mary Louise Stewart Trustee 22 September 2015
None on record
HILDA MCCAFFERTY Trustee 24 October 2012
MIGRANT TRAINING COMPANY
Received: On time