Trustees HELPAGE INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 288180

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Helen Harper | Chair | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benidicto Feliciano Belton | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacobus Retief Hoffman | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kankindi Birigenda Rose Gahire | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Flavia Di Mezza | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martine Najim | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
SAMIR KUMAR SINHA | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter S J Kaldes | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Aurora Marquez Mees | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Elizabeth Aponte Taveras | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bennett | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mika Marumoto | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clare Mealins | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Agnes Mbeere Mwaura-Mbaka | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandre Sidorenko | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.