THE WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Production of plays and other drama; courses in drama; promote the enjoyment of drama by the local population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 December 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Cox | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Phillips | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Young | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vince Hall | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH JOAN FALCON-UFF | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
ALEX RIGG | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE MELITA PARKER | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FREDERICK ROBERT THOMSON | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN DOVER | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.04k | £10.67k | £27.60k | £13.99k | £8.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.92k | £4.61k | £6.47k | £7.09k | £9.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | £2.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 3RD NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRICIATION OF SUCH ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22A Bradley Street
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Gloucestershire
GL12 7AR
- Phone:
- 01453 844060
- Email:
- parkerjane39@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window