Accounts and annual returns JOHN JAMES BRISTOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 288417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 19 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 19 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 27 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 01 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 01 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 16 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 03 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window