Financial history JOHN JAMES BRISTOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 288417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.11m £2.19m £1.35m £1.09m £1.32m
Total expenditure £2.76m £2.84m £3.31m £2.88m £2.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £177.82k £58.09k £83 £87.35k £1.26k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £17 £34 £20 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.93m £2.13m £1.35m £1.00m £1.32m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.48m £2.52m £2.97m £2.57m £2.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £280.68k £321.32k £343.58k £308.39k £285.17k
Expenditure - Governance £16.00k £14.61k £26.25k £15.60k £16.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £2.37m £2.82m £2.39m £2.05m
Expenditure - Investment management £280.68k £321.32k £343.58k £308.39k £285.17k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0