BERKSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply the income and capital of theTrust, at the discretion of the Trustees, for the "preservation, repair, maintenance, improvement, upkeep, beautification and reconstruction" of Churches of specified denominations in "Berkshire or in any Parish adjacent thereto, and of monuments, fittings, fixtures, stained glass and chattels in any sych Church or Churchyard belonging to such Churches"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 19 March 1984: Standard registration
- BERKSHIRE CHURCHES TRUST (Working name)
- R C B C T (Working name)
- ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE CHURCHES TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Violet Zeal DL | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Robin D Hartley Russell | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Barker | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Welfare | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Mather CBE | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR ANN Rice | Trustee | 27 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Haig | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr PETER DURRANT MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
TORQUIL JAMES MONTAGUE JOHNSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR J H L PUXLEY, DL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES DOUGLAS BARNES-PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.83k | £21.24k | £26.40k | £31.76k | £36.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.83k | £30.50k | £18.83k | £20.59k | £36.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED ON 2ND JUNE 1998 as amended on 08 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, UPKEEP, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF CHURCHES IN THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE OR IN ANY PARISH ADJACENT THERETO AND OF MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN SUCH CHURCHES AND OF THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO ANY OF SUCH CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE AND ANY PARISH ADJACENT THERETO
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Buckingham Road
NEWBURY
RG14 6DH
- Phone:
- 0163530709
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window