Financial history Ovalhouse Theatre Limited

Charity number: 288931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.01m £1.11m £2.08m £1.36m £1.57m
Total expenditure £1.07m £782.54k £1.17m £2.66m £2.75m
Income from government contracts £53.84k N/A N/A £50.24k £49.80k
Income from government grants £475.53k £806.91k £295.34k £604.36k £700.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £691.69k £1.05m £1.95m £622.52k £726.55k
Income - Other trading activities £129.39k £0 £18.79k £397.49k £434.55k
Income - Charitable activities £188.64k £59.14k £103.90k £339.75k £273.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.24k £3.28k £3.35k £3.61k £130.24k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £12.00k £0 £0 £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £947.15k £664.68k £1.06m £2.33m £2.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £119.13k £117.86k £106.39k £328.27k £516.20k
Expenditure - Governance £65.12k £56.87k £68.67k £84.13k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £516.20k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0