Financial history GOLD HILL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 289179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £755.72k £674.99k £1.04m £715.88k £1.10m
Total expenditure £755.73k £675.03k £1.04m £713.52k £1.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £755.72k £674.99k £1.04m £715.88k £1.10m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £755.73k £675.03k £1.04m £713.52k £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.79k £2.92k £3.06k £3.54k £4.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £672.12k £1.04m £709.51k £1.09m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0