WARREN ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising/Social Events inc- Sumer Fete, Christmas Party, Christmas Cards, Raffles, fundraising brochure sales. Spending- Library books, special needs equipment, musical equipment, school trips, purchase of new mini bus etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 June 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS JENNY COCKRILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lachia Maria Puttock | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly-Sue Bland | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Daines | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Jane Brown | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hall | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Louise Tyrell | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jane Holford | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Carr-McKenna | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Woodhouse | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alison Tracy Gibbs | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.85k | £42.72k | £235.44k | £27.82k | £37.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.04k | £3.56k | £117.24k | £152.02k | £51.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 24TH APRIL 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF WARREN SCHOOL, CLARKE'S LANE, OULTON BROAD, LOWESTOFT, SUFFOLK BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICE FOR EDUCATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greensleeves
Nightingale Road
LOWESTOFT
Suffolk
NR33 7AX
- Phone:
- 01502530237
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window