Financial history THE WATERBEACH COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £18.65k £9.90k £12.05k £15.26k £15.21k
Total expenditure £10.40k £8.55k £12.81k £27.14k £17.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A