Financial history ST MARY'S HADLEIGH CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 289784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.23k £14.68k £22.71k £13.52k £13.97k
Total expenditure £48.12k £7.72k £12.11k £53.94k £31.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £560 N/A N/A