Accounts and annual returns LIONS CLUB OF FARNHAM CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 290242
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 19 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 14 March 2019 On Time