Financial history LIONS CLUB OF FARNHAM CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 290242
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £84.85k £134.96k £102.79k £108.73k £34.39k
Total expenditure £85.17k £113.23k £133.81k £70.35k £51.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A