Financial history APOLLO YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 290271
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.48k £53.08k £61.21k £65.69k £71.34k
Total expenditure £62.99k £46.90k £56.08k £64.22k £82.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.65k £3.54k N/A N/A