CENTRAL MOSQUE OF BRENT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities. Children between 5 years to 16 years have Arabic and religious teaching classes from Monday to Friday between 5pm to 7pm. Religious scholar, who is the head Imam advises people from thec Muslim community seeking under Muslim Sharia Law any enquiry during five times prayers and in the evening - every day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 November 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amjid Ali Riaz | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TARIQ MAHMOOD DAR | Trustee | 31 December 2013 |
|
|||||
NAZAR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 31 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD NAZIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Zaffar IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAZIR AHMED NAZIR | Trustee |
|
||||||
DIL MOHAMMAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL RAUF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.35k | £134.19k | £312.39k | £317.95k | £390.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.92k | £98.34k | £127.09k | £191.98k | £277.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £35.13k | £69.78k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22/10/1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE FAITH OF ISLAM AND ISLAMIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
STATION PARADE
WILLESDEN GREEN
LONDON
NW2 4PU
- Phone:
- 02084501987
- Email:
- mrariaz@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window