Accounts and annual returns NORTH DEVON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 290640
Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window