THE PANASONIC TRUST FOR THE FURTHER EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ENGINEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is currently funding a regional programme in the Welsh Valleys that provides engineering-focused enhancement and enrichment opportunities for students and teachers in secondary schools and Post-16 as well as a bursary programme to support students progressing on to vocational education. It's aim is to create a local STEM-skilled workforce capable of meeting the region's future needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 November 1984: Standard registration
- THE PANASONIC TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Pocknell MBA, MSc | Chair | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ellena Williams | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Walker | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Driscoll | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Graham Vasey | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Morgan Blowers | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR JEAN VENABLES CBE FRENG | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Guthrie | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.28k | £439.95k | £50.91k | £53.57k | £49.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.90k | £178.46k | £102.52k | £62.31k | £68.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25TH APRIL 2002 as amended on 17 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ENGINEERING GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE FURTHER EDUCATION AND RETRAINING OF ENGINEERS IN NEW TECHOLOGY AND MATERIALS AND IN CHANGES IN DEVELOPMENT IN ENGINEERING AND THEIR SEVERAL APPLICATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Wentworth Close
Barnham
Bognor Regis
West Sussex
PO22 0HS
- Phone:
- 01243 943 059
- Email:
- DMYERS@CONSULTDARCY.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window