BRYN MAWR COLLEGE ALUMNAE ASSOCIATION-CLUB OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education of students at Bryn Mawr College, by recruiting prospective students, raising funds for bursaries and promoting alumnae charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 1984: Standard registration
- 21 July 2000: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 June 2014: Re-registered
- BRYN MAWR CLUB OF GREAT BRITAIN (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzan Miller | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mantilas | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Severa Elizabeth Von Wentzel | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Concannon | Trustee | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Savage | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amy Higham | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.58k | £27.00k | £15.12k | £5.64k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.93k | £29.08k | £11.65k | £9.74k | £5.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 19TH DECEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 17TH NOVEMBER 1986 as amended on 16 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS OF BRYN MAWR COLLEGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 Durlston Road
LONDON
London
Unknown
E5 8RP
- Phone:
- 07710505270
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window