Accounts and annual returns EDUCATION AND TRAINING SKILLS LTD

Charity number: 290878
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 16 November 2019 On Time