Financial history LIONS CLUB OF LISKEARD CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 290893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £22.07k £1.26k £18.77k £17.09k £17.48k
Total expenditure £18.81k £3.29k £17.01k £16.66k £19.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.20k N/A N/A