Accounts and annual returns NEW FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 291112
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 27 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2015 22 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 22 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2014 19 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 09 December 2014 On Time