THE FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL HORSERACING MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is the education of the public by promotion, support, assistance and improvement of the National Horseracing Museum through the activity of the group of Friends
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 February 1985: Standard registration
- 30 October 2023: Funds transferred to 283656 THE NATIONAL HORSERACING MUSEUM
No other names
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Hanbury | Chair | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Caroline Meade | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hugh Smyth | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.77k | £8.64k | £8.64k | £5.77k | £3.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.54k | £12.51k | £4.51k | £11.72k | £9.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT ASSISTING AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATIONAL HORSERACING MUSEUM THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Station Road
Fordham
Ely
CB7 5LW
- Phone:
- 07813039860
- Email:
- randm.smyth@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window