Financial history COWLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 291293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £574 £839 £220 £0 £0
Total expenditure £272 £300 £0 £1.29k £346
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A