Financial history NEWBURY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 291321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £17.20k £7.95k £17.88k £19.05k £19.74k
Total expenditure £11.44k £4.50k £13.05k £11.38k £15.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A