BRIXTON ADVICE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objectives of Brixton Advice Centre are to promote access to justice by providing good quality advice and assistance. This includes legal advice and representation to people who would otherwise be unable to afford legal services. The Centre also supports people maximise income and to better manage their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £179,076 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 May 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucas Bertholdi-Saad | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Senker | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Killian Anthony Moran | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Veena Srirangam | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel David Wachman | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
GARETH ROSS JOHN BEATON | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM FREDERICK TAGGART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £257.03k | £348.87k | £212.00k | £331.65k | £384.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.63k | £304.08k | £287.12k | £331.78k | £338.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £103.25k | £127.00k | £102.00k | £137.11k | £179.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF GREATER LONDON.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIXTON ADVICE CENTRE
165-167 RAILTON ROAD
LONDON
SE24 0LU
- Phone:
- 0207 733 7554
- Email:
- info@brixtonadvice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window