Financial history CANTERBURY OAST TRUST

Charity number: 291662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.55m £6.89m £6.68m £6.61m £7.64m
Total expenditure £6.54m £5.88m £6.52m £8.18m £8.35m
Income from government contracts £4.38m £4.55m £4.74m £4.66m £4.37m
Income from government grants N/A £495.40k £214.46k £20.37k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £572.30k £432.82k £476.81k £384.80k £684.48k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.97m £5.12m £6.15m £6.18m £6.93m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.37k £2.90k £923 £4.30k £13.41k
Income - Other £0 £1.33m £61.00k £39.62k £15.35k
Income - Legacies £150.83k £20.02k £15.00k £75.00k £266.97k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.49m £5.82m £6.45m £8.10m £8.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £44.41k £51.60k £60.92k £71.91k £34.91k
Expenditure - Governance £65.57k £64.21k £62.06k £74.95k £81.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £7.34k £5.52k £5.24k £8.76k £1.15k