Financial history NENE VALLEY ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST

Charity Number: 291811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £46.70k £27.31k £7.67k £10.36k £8.77k
Total expenditure £43.27k £25.43k £5.78k £666 £13.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A