Trustees CAMDEN CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX SERVICE LIMITED
Charity number: 291955

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Guy | Chair | 17 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Juliet Marber | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Goldhill | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Elizabeth Taylor | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Fiona Mcleod | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kushalta Saini | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eve Helen Castelow | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ferguson | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Albert Jacob Schoen | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Wyatt | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Douglas Bond | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID ATKINSON | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.