Financial history THE STUART ROSSITER TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 292076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £23.64k £25.04k £34.95k £32.07k £36.38k
Total expenditure £8.45k £10.94k £8.68k £29.12k £15.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A