Financial history CREATIVE KERNOW LIMITED

Charity number: 292138
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.94m £2.49m £3.19m £3.68m £3.07m
Total expenditure £1.96m £2.31m £3.03m £3.13m £3.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20m £1.76m £495.41k £423.59k £1.70m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.26m £1.78m £2.24m £2.00m £1.75m
Income - Other trading activities £572.34k £678.65k £739.31k £963.72k £1.08m
Income - Charitable activities £111.12k £21.77k £140.42k £95.96k £73.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.43k £1.37k £1.30k £5.22k £17.19k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £606.04k £151.13k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.32m £1.62m £2.34m £2.26m £2.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £689.58k £696.44k £872.09k £1.11m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.02k £14.77k £35.20k £25.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £644.05k £0 £0 £0 £0