Accounts and annual returns WHITSTABLE VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity number: 292207
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 23 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 23 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 12 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 12 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 09 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 09 August 2010 On Time