Financial history WHITSTABLE VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity number: 292207
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £77.30k £118.28k £84.16k £65.23k £59.91k
Total expenditure £82.35k £85.98k £86.86k £73.60k £83.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A