THE DUTCH COTTAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain and preserve the Dutch Cottage as a building of local historical interest and importance to the town of Rayleigh in Essex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 22 September 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHAIRMAN OF THE NATIONAL TRUST RAYLEIGH MOUNT LOCAL COMMITTEE | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Chairman of Rayleigh Town Council | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|||||
CHAIRMAN OF ROCHFORD DISTRICT COUNCIL | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|||||
VICE-CHAIRMAN OF ROCHFORD DISTRICT COUNCIL | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.46k | £5.28k | £5.43k | £6.12k | £7.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.23k | £6.44k | £1.34k | £6.43k | £11.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 APRIL 1964 AS AMENDED BY TRUSTEES RESOLUTION DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2008 AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74D OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 (AS AMENDED BY THE CHARITIES ACT 2006) DATED 26 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO BE PRESERVED IN ITS PRESENT FORM AS A TRADITIONAL DUTCH COTTAGE AND TO BE USED OCCUPIED AND ENJOYED FOR SUCH PURPOSE AS SHALL BE APPROVED BY THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rochford District Council
Council Offices
South Street
Rochford
SS4 1BW
- Phone:
- 01702546366
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window