Financial history KREDITOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 292649
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £70.10k £87.05k £185.02k £60.40k £120.31k
Total expenditure £53.16k £42.55k £75.82k £143.12k £86.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A