SHREE KUTCH SATSANG SWAMINARAYAN TEMPLE - SOUTH EAST LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance and proliferate the Hindu faith in accordance with the principles and teachings of Lord Swaminarayan as delineated in the Sampraday scriptures
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

22 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 October 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Parbat Shivji Kerai | Chair | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arvind Shamji Bhanderi | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dinesh Harish Hirani | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Teja | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bhavesh Shamji Varsani | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mavji Devji Kerai | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jignesh Parbat Hirani | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PARBAT PREMJI RUDA | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Dhanji Mavji Kerai | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nilesh Bhimji Pindoria | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harish Dhanji Hirani | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vinay Parbat Kerai | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sunil Assani | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Haresh Vekariya | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayantilal Kerai | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hirji Premji Patel | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DHANJI KANJI | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hirji Kanji Bhudia | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PREMJI BHIMJI MANJI | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Khushal Parbat Ruda | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ramji Premji Patel | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayant Parbat Hirani | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.29k | £123.68k | £236.88k | £389.92k | £362.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.54k | £119.34k | £178.86k | £246.04k | £263.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 May 2025 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 May 2025 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 411 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/09/1985 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/1998 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/2014 as amended on 23 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE HINDU FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND FAITHS OF LORD SWAMINARAYAN AND TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH PRINCIPLES. 2. TO RELIEVE THE AGED THE POOR THE SICK AND THE DISABLED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Margarets Grove
LONDON
Plumstead
SE18 7RL
- Phone:
- 02088540823
- Email:
- admin@sksswoolwich.org
- Website:
-
sksswoolwich.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window