Trustees LAWYERS MUSIC
Charity number: 293015

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isabella Dal Soglio | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Le Brocq | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Jane Curd | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sahar Sadoughi | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Ben Cater | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Constance Webbe | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Tuppen | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Frederick George Hess | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
SEAN MICHAEL GIBBONS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.