THE CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust aims to support and strengthen Christian Schools and to promote Christian education across the UK and abroad by providing training events, resources and advice and by facilitating research and collaboration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 April 1986: Standard registration
- THE CHRISTIAN VIDEO EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN WILTSHIRE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Walze | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|||||
BARBARA LORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROGER STANLEY SLACK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.23k | £27.64k | £21.83k | £31.02k | £38.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.30k | £25.67k | £21.63k | £33.43k | £48.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 25 APRIL 1989 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodbine Cottage
Stainsacre
WHITBY
YO22 4NT
- Phone:
- 01905759740
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window