SOUTHEAST ASIAN OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proclaim Christ's love and Lordship through practical development work in partnership with others in Cambodia. Encourage church growth, with a special focus on the poor and marginalised, facilitating a healthy church with strong local leadership with a vision for discipleship. Raise awareness of Cambodia in the UK, to meet the needs of poverty alleviation and growth of the Cambodian church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambodia
Governance
- 08 January 1986: Standard registration
- CAMBODIA ACTION (Working name)
- SAO CAMBODIA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN ADAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Zoran Sulc | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
David Buchan | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Robert Arthur Dixon | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.61k | £124.13k | £114.65k | £91.01k | £129.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.51k | £124.74k | £107.34k | £95.72k | £133.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 NOVEMBER 1985 AND DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 12 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG THE PEOPLES OF COUNTRIES IN SOUTH EAST ASIA OR AMONG SUCH PEOPLE WHO ARE NOW REFUGEES OR WHO ARE FOR SIMILAR REASONS LIVING IN OTHER COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Area of benefit
COUNTRIES IN SOUTH EAST ASIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Bushey Ley
WELWYN GARDEN CITY
Hertfordshire
AL7 3EY
- Phone:
- 07749467049
- Email:
- c.catlin@cambodiaaction.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window