Accounts and annual returns RAVENSBOURNE LIGHT OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 293387
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 21 March 2025 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 17 April 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 20 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 March 2022 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required