Financial history RAVENSBOURNE LIGHT OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 293387
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £5.68k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A