Financial history NEWPIER CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 293686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £561.61k £630.63k £677.00k £588.55k £565.85k
Total expenditure £622.46k £622.21k £618.95k £694.25k £517.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £174.56k £71.05k £143.50k £153.90k £145.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £174.56k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £387.02k £556.63k £533.50k £434.65k £420.85k
Income - Other £24 £2.96k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £71.05k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £142.25k £76.99k £618.95k £694.25k £517.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £480.21k £478.02k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £22.39k £45.79k £59.25k £46.51k £42.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £499.60k £590.36k £430.85k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £67.20k £0 £0 £0