Financial history ENGLISH SETTER RESCUE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 293708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.31k £9.59k £136.06k £139.76k £150.25k
Total expenditure £21.87k £16.85k £13.13k £24.61k £10.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A