MAPLE LEAF TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees of the Maple Leaf Trust organize a variety of fundraising events (annual dinner and auction etc.) to help raise funds for its two charitable causes: scholarships for Canadian graduate students studying in the UK and financial assistance for needy Canadian WWII veterans or their surviving spouses who are living in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 April 1986: Standard registration
- 06 October 2015: Funds received from 1105941 CANADA HOUSE ARTS TRUST
- MAPLE LEAF BALL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT JAMES BRANT | Chair | 24 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Courtney Lay | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Gallant | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Douglas Ray McPhee | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Scott Daniel McVittie | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER TRIPP BLACK | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JERRY DEL MISSIER | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £324.83k | £17.86k | £31.42k | £420.50k | £11.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.64k | £98.89k | £107.54k | £316.88k | £120.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12/03/1986 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 08/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY,DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND,IN PARTICULAR, FOR PERSONS OF CANADIAN ORIGIN AND THEIR FAMILIES,SPECIAL REGARD BEING GIVEN TO THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONG FORMER CANADIAN SERVICEMEN AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE ALSO IN NEED RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAPLE LEAF TRUST
Canadian High Commission
Canada House
5 Trafalgar Square
LONDON
SW1Y 5BJ
- Phone:
- 02079303889
- Email:
- info@mapleleaftrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window