Financial history THE BEDFORD ARCHITECTURAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 294122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.82k £1.04k £2.90k £3.03k £28.42k
Total expenditure £2.34k £962 £1.14k £2.52k £1.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A