THE BEDFORD ARCHITECTURAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lectures on a regular basic during autumn, winter and spring. Visits to places of interesr during the summer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 11 April 1986: Standard registration
- BAALHS (Working name)
- BEDFORD ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- BEDFORD ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT NIGEL RICKETTS | Chair |
|
||||||||
sarah joanne barrow mrs | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Penelope Janet Stanbridge | Trustee | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET CARPENTER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SYLVIA WOODS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.82k | £1.04k | £2.90k | £3.03k | £28.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £962 | £1.14k | £2.52k | £1.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27TH MARCH 1986 AS AMENDED ON 17 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 11 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
2. THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN: (I) THE SUBJECTS OF ARCHAEOLOGY, INCLUDING EXCAVATIONS IN THE FIELD, AND LOCAL AND NATIONAL HISTORY: (II) THE APPRECIATION OF BUILDINGS OF ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORICAL INTEREST, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE TOWN OF BEDFORD, AND TO PROMOTE THEIR CONSERVATION, AND THAT OF AREAS OF LANDSCAPE VALUE
Area of benefit
BEDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 HARRINGTON DRIVE
BEDFORD
MK41 8DB
- Phone:
- 01234360003
- Email:
- mo@mikecarpenter33.plus.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window