Financial history THE CRUDWELL VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 294177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.55k £46.73k £24.86k £36.65k £50.07k
Total expenditure £16.09k £31.11k £31.02k £23.26k £52.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.53k N/A N/A N/A