HACKNEY SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the Society follow its objectives to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects, by the presentation of public concerts and recitals and by other ways as determined by the Society through its Committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hackney
Governance
- 18 June 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Greene | Chair | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Arthur Ian Legend Davis | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ebbutt | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Price | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Irene Gooding Gibson | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Williams | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Sired | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Carole Sired | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cathie O'Driscoll | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Glynn | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Koestle-Cate | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.56k | £32.92k | £7.51k | £37.55k | £46.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.36k | £32.47k | £9.87k | £40.35k | £33.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 July 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 July 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 FEB 1986 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 1992 AS AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2010 AS AMENDED ON 06 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Derby Road
LONDON
E18 2PS
- Phone:
- 020 8505 8354
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window