BRITISH LEBANESE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage friendship and understanding and to advance and encourage cultural development between the peoples of Great Britain and Lebanon including the promotion of scholarships and help for disadvantaged children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 June 1986: Standard registration
- B L A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir David Frank Richmond | Chair | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Baria Alamuddin | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
LISA ZAKHEM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIA SHAMMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £413.64k | £12.03k | £165.23k | £41.93k | £34.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.31k | £69.80k | £288.76k | £82.67k | £34.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 September 2021 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 September 2021 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 August 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH JULY 1985 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 15TH APRIL 1986 as amended on 15 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Association is established are to: (a) advance the education of the people of the United Kingdom and the people of Lebanon and in particular but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing to advance education in the history, art, music, language and literature of the Lebanon and of the United Kingdom (provided always that the Association shall not promote encourage or pursue any political object or purpose whatsoever whether acting by itself or in association with any other body of persons having objects similar to all or any of the objects of the Association); and (b) to relieve the poverty, deprivation, and hardship of the people of Lebanon, including without limitation, by directly or indirectly supporting or relieving those in need by reason of war, famine, displacement, migration or refugee status, unemployment, homelessness, youth, age, ill-health, lack of education, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage; (c) to repair, maintain, improve, upkeep and preserve the heritage of Lebanese historical sites, buildings, assets, artefacts or other property which are valuable from a heritage perspective; and (d) promote sustainable development for the benefit of the general public in Lebanon by (i) the preservation, conservation and the protection of the environment and the prudent use of resources, and (ii) the promotion of sustainable means of achieving economic growth and regeneration. Sustainable development means ‘development that meets the needs of the present without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs’.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE LEBANON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITISH LEBANESE ASSOCIATION LTD
1 HYDE PARK GATE
LONDON
SW7 5EW
- Phone:
- 02073702572
- Email:
- MAIL@BRITISHLEBANESE.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window